TN SB2114 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits any person, governmental entity, or other legal entity, including a utility district, that offers goods or services to consumers from rounding up the consumer's bill for goods or services without obtaining the consumer's express, written permission to opt-in to such a billing procedure. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 45; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 62 and Title 65.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits any person, governmental entity, or other legal entity, including a utility district, that offers goods or services to consumers from rounding up the consumer's bill for goods or services without obtaining the consumer's express, written permission to opt-in to such a billing procedure. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 45; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 62 and Title 65.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2495 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback