TN HB2495 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits any person, governmental entity, or other legal entity, including a utility district, that offers goods or services to consumers from rounding up the consumer's bill for goods or services without obtaining the consumer's express, written permission to opt-in to such a billing procedure. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 45; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 62 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, prohibits any person, governmental entity, or other legal entity, including a utility district, that offers goods or services to consumers from rounding up the consumer's bill for goods or services without obtaining the consumer's express, written permission to opt-in to such a billing procedure. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 45; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 62 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2114 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee