TN SB2108 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of correction to pay an additional $5.00 per day recidivism-reduction stipend for certain county jails housing convicted felons, in which the felons attend evidence-based programs to reduce recidivism rates upon release; authorizes community colleges and colleges of applied technology to assist county governments in development of such programs. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 8, Chapter 26; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of correction to pay an additional $5.00 per day recidivism-reduction stipend for certain county jails housing convicted felons, in which the felons attend evidence-based programs to reduce recidivism rates upon release; authorizes community colleges and colleges of applied technology to assist county governments in development of such programs. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 8, Chapter 26; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2136 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration