TN HB2136 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of correction to pay an additional $5.00 per day recidivism-reduction stipend for certain county jails housing convicted felons, in which the felons attend evidence-based programs to reduce recidivism rates upon release; authorizes community colleges and colleges of applied technology to assist county governments in development of such programs. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 8, Chapter 26; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department of correction to pay an additional $5.00 per day recidivism-reduction stipend for certain county jails housing convicted felons, in which the felons attend evidence-based programs to reduce recidivism rates upon release; authorizes community colleges and colleges of applied technology to assist county governments in development of such programs. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 8, Chapter 26; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-06-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-06-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 1
2020-06-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0898)
2020-06-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0730)
2020-06-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0971)
2020-06-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020
2020-06-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-15HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-11HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020
2020-06-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
2020-06-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-06-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020
2020-05-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-04HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/4/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-03HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2108 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback