TN SB2093 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the official policy for the maintenance of records by the department of tourist development. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 10, Chapter 7, relative to records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1692 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.