TN SB2092 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits public employers from discriminating against applicants for employment and employees with pregnancy-related conditions by not providing the applicants and employees with reasonable accommodations. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Title
As introduced, prohibits public employers from discriminating against applicants for employment and employees with pregnancy-related conditions by not providing the applicants and employees with reasonable accommodations. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1985 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee