TN SB2091 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lessens the amount of time that a seller of a pre-need funeral contract has to retain records concerning the pre-need funeral contract and information relating to the sale from five years after the death of the beneficiary to three years. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, lessens the amount of time that a seller of a pre-need funeral contract has to retain records concerning the pre-need funeral contract and information relating to the sale from five years after the death of the beneficiary to three years. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1889 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee