TN SB2089 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, the counties within which each LEA must implement a program of family life education from counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 17 to counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 19; prohibits persons present on school property from making abortion referrals or from otherwise advocating or encouraging abortion. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, changes, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, the counties within which each LEA must implement a program of family life education from counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 17 to counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 19; prohibits persons present on school property from making abortion referrals or from otherwise advocating or encouraging abortion. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0529) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0588) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2135 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee