TN HB2135 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, the counties within which each LEA must implement a program of family life education from counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 17 to counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 19; prohibits persons present on school property from making abortion referrals or from otherwise advocating or encouraging abortion. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, changes, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, the counties within which each LEA must implement a program of family life education from counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 17 to counties with a pregnancy rate of 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females ages 15 to 19; prohibits persons present on school property from making abortion referrals or from otherwise advocating or encouraging abortion. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2089 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.