TN SB2085 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises the charter. - Amends Chapter 551 of the Acts of 1903; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises the charter. - Amends Chapter 551 of the Acts of 1903; as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-03-29 | Recalled from Clerk's desk | |
2011-03-10 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2011-03-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-03-08 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2085&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2085.pdf |