TN SB2068 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Shelby County to exercise discretion over the manner in which a county board of public utilities that it may create will be constituted; requires a board or administrative agency in Shelby County that is increasing the charges for fire protection services by more than 10 percent to obtain approval for the increase from the county legislative body prior to the increase taking effect. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 16.
Title
As enacted, authorizes Shelby County to exercise discretion over the manner in which a county board of public utilities that it may create will be constituted; requires a board or administrative agency in Shelby County that is increasing the charges for fire protection services by more than 10 percent to obtain approval for the increase from the county legislative body prior to the increase taking effect. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 738 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2018 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0962) |
2018-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0781) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2170 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738