TN HB2170 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Shelby County to exercise discretion over the manner in which a county board of public utilities that it may create will be constituted; requires a board or administrative agency in Shelby County that is increasing the charges for fire protection services by more than 10 percent to obtain approval for the increase from the county legislative body prior to the increase taking effect. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 16.
Title
As enacted, authorizes Shelby County to exercise discretion over the manner in which a county board of public utilities that it may create will be constituted; requires a board or administrative agency in Shelby County that is increasing the charges for fire protection services by more than 10 percent to obtain approval for the increase from the county legislative body prior to the increase taking effect. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Lollar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738 | |
2018-04-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2068 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 738