TN SB2061 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, corrects cross-reference in code from "§ 62-11-108" to "§ 62-11-109." - Amends TCA Section 62-11-106.
Title
As introduced, corrects cross-reference in code from "§ 62-11-108" to "§ 62-11-109." - Amends TCA Section 62-11-106.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-03-16 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-13 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/16/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2017 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-04 - Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM