TN SB2060 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires retailers to collect state and local sales taxes on goods and services sold for resale in a subsequent retail transaction; provides purchasers of such goods and services may claim a monthly refund for such taxes paid from the department of revenue. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires retailers to collect state and local sales taxes on goods and services sold for resale in a subsequent retail transaction; provides purchasers of such goods and services may claim a monthly refund for such taxes paid from the department of revenue. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2210 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee