TN SB2052 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes department to issue certificate of free sale for food, drugs, or cosmetics if manufacturer or distributor is authorized to manufacture or distribute the product and it can be sold freely or the party has provided documentation of FDA inspection and the party appears to be authorized to sell. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes department to issue certificate of free sale for food, drugs, or cosmetics if manufacturer or distributor is authorized to manufacture or distribute the product and it can be sold freely or the party has provided documentation of FDA inspection and the party appears to be authorized to sell. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Comm | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2052&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2052.pdf |