TN SB2047 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Close the Tennessee Medicare Coverage Gap Act," which requires the bureau to establish an alternative benefit plan consistent with federal requirements through which certain individuals between 19 and 65 years of age will receive benefits if not presently covered by TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Close the Tennessee Medicare Coverage Gap Act," which requires the bureau to establish an alternative benefit plan consistent with federal requirements through which certain individuals between 19 and 65 years of age will receive benefits if not presently covered by TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2432 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee