TN SB2042 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires employers to pay employees no less than the minimum wage, regardless of the subminimum wage for an employee whose earning or productive capacity is impaired by age, physical, or mental deficiency or injury. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 50, relative to wages.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 870 | |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-28 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0749) |
2022-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0565) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2078 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870