TN HB2078 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires employers to pay employees no less than the minimum wage, regardless of the subminimum wage for an employee whose earning or productive capacity is impaired by age, physical, or mental deficiency or injury. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 50, relative to wages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2042 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022