TN SB2036 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 841
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 841
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the governor, in appointing members to the board of regents, to strive to ensure that at least one board member is an honorably discharged military veteran; requires that in making appointments to the state university boards and UT board of regents the governor strive to ensure members are diverse in honorable military service in addition to gender, race, perspective, and experience. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201 and Section 49-9-202.
Title
As enacted, requires the governor, in appointing members to the board of regents, to strive to ensure that at least one board member is an honorably discharged military veteran; requires that in making appointments to the state university boards and UT board of regents the governor strive to ensure members are diverse in honorable military service in addition to gender, race, perspective, and experience. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201 and Section 49-9-202.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 841 | |
2018-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/26/2018 | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA1026) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1026) |
2018-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2682 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 841