TN HB2682 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 841
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 841
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the governor, in appointing members to the board of regents, to strive to ensure that at least one board member is an honorably discharged military veteran; requires that in making appointments to the state university boards and UT board of regents the governor strive to ensure members are diverse in honorable military service in addition to gender, race, perspective, and experience. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201 and Section 49-9-202.
Title
As enacted, requires the governor, in appointing members to the board of regents, to strive to ensure that at least one board member is an honorably discharged military veteran; requires that in making appointments to the state university boards and UT board of regents the governor strive to ensure members are diverse in honorable military service in addition to gender, race, perspective, and experience. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201 and Section 49-9-202.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 841 | |
2018-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2179 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
SB2036 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 841
SB2036 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 841