TN SB2005 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows certain cities to operate fiber optic facilities and use such facilities to provide broadband services to certain customers. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, allows certain cities to operate fiber optic facilities and use such facilities to provide broadband services to certain customers. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52, Part 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1974 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2005&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2005.pdf |