TN SB2003 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offense of unlawful exposure to include the distribution, with the intent to cause emotional distress, of an image of the intimate parts of another identifiable person or an image of an identifiable person engaged in sexually explicit conduct and the image was created or modified by means of a computer software program, artificial intelligence application, or other digital editing tools; specifies that for the purposes of sexual exploitation of children offenses, the term "material" includes computer-generated images created, adapted, or modified by artificial intelligence. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to unlawful images.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1964 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee