TN HB1964 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offense of unlawful exposure to include the distribution, with the intent to cause emotional distress, of an image of the intimate parts of another identifiable person or an image of an identifiable person engaged in sexually explicit conduct and the image was created or modified by means of a computer software program, artificial intelligence application, or other digital editing tools; specifies that for the purposes of sexual exploitation of children offenses, the term "material" includes computer-generated images created, adapted, or modified by artificial intelligence. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to unlawful images.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2003 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee