TN SB1996 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes use of money orders, debit cards, and prepaid gift cards to purchase lottery tickets; revises other provisions concerning prize claims and lottery devices. - Amends TCA Section 4-51-108 and Section 4-51-123.
Title
As introduced, authorizes use of money orders, debit cards, and prepaid gift cards to purchase lottery tickets; revises other provisions concerning prize claims and lottery devices. - Amends TCA Section 4-51-108 and Section 4-51-123.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2057 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1996&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SB1996.pdf |