TN SB1995 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to price gouging. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to price gouging. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 624 | |
2018-04-06 | Effective date(s) 04/02/2018 | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0806) |
2018-03-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0644) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2037 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624