TN HB2037 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions relative to price gouging. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions relative to price gouging. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624
2018-03-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-19HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-03-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1995 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 624

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback