TN SB1970 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the ability for municipalities to choose a process for distributing payments of tax equivalent amounts to taxing jurisdictions different than what is provided in law; authorizes a county legislative body to pass a resolution requiring municipal electric systems to direct payment of tax equivalent amounts to the taxing jurisdictions as provided by law. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52.
Title
As introduced, removes the ability for municipalities to choose a process for distributing payments of tax equivalent amounts to taxing jurisdictions different than what is provided in law; authorizes a county legislative body to pass a resolution requiring municipal electric systems to direct payment of tax equivalent amounts to the taxing jurisdictions as provided by law. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2066 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee