TN SB1955 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Second Amendment Civil Rights Act of 2018"; confers private right of action upon a person to challenge a government entity that refuses to make property available to third parties for Second Amendment activities when the property is made available for other activities; prohibits government entity from banning the possession of a handgun by a handgun permit holder on property owned or administered by the entity unless security officers inspect all persons entering the premises. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Second Amendment Civil Rights Act of 2018"; confers private right of action upon a person to challenge a government entity that refuses to make property available to third parties for Second Amendment activities when the property is made available for other activities; prohibits government entity from banning the possession of a handgun by a handgun permit holder on property owned or administered by the entity unless security officers inspect all persons entering the premises. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1602 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee