TN SB1953 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, states that, as used in the offense of stalking, harassment must be committed by the defendant with reckless disregard for whether the victim will suffer emotional distress as a result of the conduct and the victim does suffer emotional distress as a result of the conduct. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to disorderly conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 682 | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2546 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 682