TN HB2546 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, states that, as used in the offense of stalking, harassment must be committed by the defendant with reckless disregard for whether the victim will suffer emotional distress as a result of the conduct and the victim does suffer emotional distress as a result of the conduct. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to disorderly conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 682 | |
2024-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1953 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024