TN SB1951 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows counties and municipalities to create exemption to local option sales tax for replacement trees purchased toward commercial or public utility property's required tree density. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, allows counties and municipalities to create exemption to local option sales tax for replacement trees purchased toward commercial or public utility property's required tree density. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal. | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1542 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1951&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1951.pdf |