TN HB1542 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows counties and municipalities to create exemption to local option sales tax for replacement trees purchased toward commercial or public utility property's required tree density. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, allows counties and municipalities to create exemption to local option sales tax for replacement trees purchased toward commercial or public utility property's required tree density. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-04-15 | Ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1951 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1542&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1542.pdf |