TN SB1934 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits political subdivisions from prohibiting by ordinance, resolution, regulation, code, or any other requirement, the connection or reconnection of a utility service based on the type or source of energy to be delivered to an individual customer. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, prohibits political subdivisions from prohibiting by ordinance, resolution, regulation, code, or any other requirement, the connection or reconnection of a utility service based on the type or source of energy to be delivered to an individual customer. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 591 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 8, PNV 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0562) |
2020-03-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 2 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0541) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1838 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 591