TN SB1910 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a copy of the annual report and audit of a tourism development authority to be sent to each member of the general assembly who represents any municipality involved in authorizing creation of such authority. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 69.
Title
As introduced, requires that a copy of the annual report and audit of a tourism development authority to be sent to each member of the general assembly who represents any municipality involved in authorizing creation of such authority. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 69.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1986 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1910&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1910.pdf |