TN SB1888 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain professionals in the fields of barbering and cosmetology to complete five hours of biennial continuing education prior to license renewal; directs the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners to determine the qualifying curriculum. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires certain professionals in the fields of barbering and cosmetology to complete five hours of biennial continuing education prior to license renewal; directs the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners to determine the qualifying curriculum. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1483 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-06 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee