TN HB1483 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain professionals in the fields of barbering and cosmetology to complete five hours of biennial continuing education prior to license renewal; directs the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners to determine the qualifying curriculum. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires certain professionals in the fields of barbering and cosmetology to complete five hours of biennial continuing education prior to license renewal; directs the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners to determine the qualifying curriculum. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1888 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee