TN SB1880 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 803
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 803
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing workers' compensation in regard to the case management system and settlements. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions governing workers' compensation in regard to the case management system and settlements. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 803 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2016; 01/01/2017 | |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-31 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-31 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0760) |
2016-03-31 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0715) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2038 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 803