TN SB1878 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a law enforcement officer who is carrying a firearm on school grounds when not engaged in the actual discharge of the officer's official duties to give notice that the officer is carrying the weapon not only to the principal or an appropriate person in the principal's office but also to the assistant principal. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, allows a law enforcement officer who is carrying a firearm on school grounds when not engaged in the actual discharge of the officer's official duties to give notice that the officer is carrying the weapon not only to the principal or an appropriate person in the principal's office but also to the assistant principal. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2393 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1878&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1878.pdf |