TN SB1860 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes salary for board of parole members; authorizes payment of travel expenses only for members who attend parole hearings and board meetings. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 28.
Title
As introduced, removes salary for board of parole members; authorizes payment of travel expenses only for members who attend parole hearings and board meetings. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 28.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1860&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB1860.pdf |