TN SB1860 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 963
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 963
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Neighborhood Preservation Nonprofit Corporation Act". - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 29; Title 38; Title 48; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Neighborhood Preservation Nonprofit Corporation Act". - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 29; Title 38; Title 48; Title 66 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 963 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/19/2014; 01/01/2015 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1100) |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1030) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2214 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 963