TN SB1859 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the percentage of a misdemeanor sentence that a court may require a defendant to serve from 75 percent to 100 percent. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40 and Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2, relative to misdemeanor sentences.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Brent Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 743 | |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1920 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024