TN SB1857 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from requiring right-of-way dedications from landowners with property located along an existing public right-of-way; authorizes governmental entities to require a right-of-way reservation as a condition of approving any proposed subdivision of property; clarifies that a real estate licensee has no duty to inform any party to a real estate transaction concerning a right-of-way reservation. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 62 and Title 66.
Title
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from requiring right-of-way dedications from landowners with property located along an existing public right-of-way; authorizes governmental entities to require a right-of-way reservation as a condition of approving any proposed subdivision of property; clarifies that a real estate licensee has no duty to inform any party to a real estate transaction concerning a right-of-way reservation. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 62 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2048 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to TACIR Calendar