TN HB2048 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to TACIR Calendar
Pending: House Property & Planning Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to TACIR Calendar
Pending: House Property & Planning Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from requiring right-of-way dedications from landowners with property located along an existing public right-of-way; authorizes governmental entities to require a right-of-way reservation as a condition of approving any proposed subdivision of property; clarifies that a real estate licensee has no duty to inform any party to a real estate transaction concerning a right-of-way reservation. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 62 and Title 66.
Title
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from requiring right-of-way dedications from landowners with property located along an existing public right-of-way; authorizes governmental entities to require a right-of-way reservation as a condition of approving any proposed subdivision of property; clarifies that a real estate licensee has no duty to inform any party to a real estate transaction concerning a right-of-way reservation. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 62 and Title 66.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to TACIR Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1857 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee