TN SB1842 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the offense of burglary includes entering a building other than a habitation, or any portion of the building, not open to the public and committing or attempting to commit a felony, theft, or assault, while the same behavior in a habitation is aggravated burglary. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to burglary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2439 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee