TN SB1839 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a physician to provide prenatal and postpartum medical care to pregnant prisoners and detainees; requires correctional institutions to provide pregnant prisoners nutritionally appropriate meals and supplemental provisions. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, requires a physician to provide prenatal and postpartum medical care to pregnant prisoners and detainees; requires correctional institutions to provide pregnant prisoners nutritionally appropriate meals and supplemental provisions. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762 | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1651 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 762