TN HB1651 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a physician to provide prenatal and postpartum medical care to pregnant prisoners and detainees; requires correctional institutions to provide pregnant prisoners nutritionally appropriate meals and supplemental provisions. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires a physician to provide prenatal and postpartum medical care to pregnant prisoners and detainees; requires correctional institutions to provide pregnant prisoners nutritionally appropriate meals and supplemental provisions. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Pub. Ch. 762
2020-07-02 Effective date(s) 07/01/2020
2020-06-30 Signed by Governor.
2020-06-30HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-06-18SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2020-06-18SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-06-10SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-06-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-06-08HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020
2020-05-29HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 6/5/2020
2020-05-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020
2020-05-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseMeeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-26HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 2/26/2020
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2020-01-22HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2020-01-16HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1839 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback