TN SB1822 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs to provide opportunity for enrollment in a pre-kindergarten program to all children who are four years of age by September 30 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires LEAs to provide opportunity for enrollment in a pre-kindergarten program to all children who are four years of age by September 30 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1648 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-03 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee