TN SB1820 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that an entity licensed for on-premises consumption may include contiguous areas in its designated premises; adds designation as festival operator for purposes of those authorized to sell for on-premises consumption; revises other on-premises consumption provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, specifies that an entity licensed for on-premises consumption may include contiguous areas in its designated premises; adds designation as festival operator for purposes of those authorized to sell for on-premises consumption; revises other on-premises consumption provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755 | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1976 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 755