TN HB1976 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that an entity licensed for on-premises consumption may include contiguous areas in its designated premises; adds designation as festival operator for purposes of those authorized to sell for on-premises consumption; revises other on-premises consumption provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, specifies that an entity licensed for on-premises consumption may include contiguous areas in its designated premises; adds designation as festival operator for purposes of those authorized to sell for on-premises consumption; revises other on-premises consumption provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 49 N: 32 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 49 N: 32 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 755 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2018 | |
2018-04-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-02 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 68, Nays 18 PNV 5 HB1976 |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0692) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0841) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed H. as am., Ayes 71, Nays 15, PNV 9 |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | House | Failed to pass H., Ayes 49, Nays 32, PNV 8 |
2018-03-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0752) |
2018-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1820 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755