TN SB1814 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various revisions to provisions related to property that is exempt from execution, seizure, or attachment. - Amends TCA Section 26-2-111.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 26-2-111, relative to personal property exempted from execution, seizure, or attachment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Effective date(s) 05/01/2024 | |
2024-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 833 | |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2839 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 833